Main content

## 5th grade (Eureka Math/EngageNY)

### Unit 2: Lesson 2

Topic B: The standard algorithm for multi-digit whole number multiplication- Relate multiplication with area models to the standard algorithm
- Intro to standard way of multiplying multi-digit numbers
- Understanding the standard algorithm for multiplication
- Using area model and properties to multiply
- Multiplying with distributive property
- Multiplying with area model: 6 x 7981
- Multiplying with area model: 78 x 65
- Multiplying with area model: 16 x 27
- Multiply 2-digit numbers with area models
- Multiplying multi-digit numbers: 6,742x23
- Multi-digit multiplication
- Multiply by 1-digit numbers with standard algorithm

© 2023 Khan AcademyTerms of usePrivacy PolicyCookie Notice

# Multiplying multi-digit numbers: 6,742x23

CCSS.Math:

Sal uses the standard algorithm for multiplication to multiply 6,742 times 23. Created by Sal Khan.

## Want to join the conversation?

- I think i know that question?

Hi dsupraja05

So like he said when you multiply you half to add to get your awenser beacuse when you stack your numbers you will just have a number cake so that is why you add. -I think(19 votes) - i dont think that people use math that much anymore, they use calculators(12 votes)
- Hi, you still need to know math to be able to use calculators in a good way. So keep learning math and you will do well with calculators too :) Without knowledge in math a person cannot keep learning and doing things with math, even if they have a calculator.(11 votes)

- Thank you for helping and teaching us!(9 votes)
- Why do I keep failing?!😭(7 votes)
- 6742 x 23 well when you finish mulipling the 3 you add a zero below the ones place because 20+3 = 23 the zero you add is cause the 2 is the tens place then you multiply 2 x 6742(5 votes)

- asdfghjklqwertyuiopzxcvbnm,(5 votes)
- hi booshkees have a great day yall(5 votes)
- Didn’t people learn this in like, 4th grade?(3 votes)
- Yeah we learned this in 4 grade but it beacomes harder and you wouldn't remember(2 votes)

- I don’t get it. When I do all the steps it says I did it wrong(2 votes)
- Then you have a math error somewhere. Without seeing your actual work, I can't tell you where the error is. Use the hints to compare your work with the work in the exercise. This would help you find your error and avoid future mistakes.(4 votes)

- Hi guys!! How are all of you doing today?(3 votes)
- Great, but this is two years past your 'today'. Thx for asking!

--*Mimi*(0 votes)

- jonah you know you need math to get in the navy right(2 votes)

## Video transcript

- [Instructor] In this video, we're going to try to
compute 6742 times 23. So like always, pause this video and try to compute it for yourself. All right, now let's
work on this together. And I'm going to do it
using what's often known as the standard algorithm. Algorithm is just a fancy
word for a series of steps, a process for doing something. So we have 6742 times 23. And so I'm gonna write the 23 in the same place values. So that's two 10s, so I'm gonna write it under the four 10s over there. And then three ones. I'll write it under the two ones. And it's important to realize this isn't the only way
to multiply numbers. In fact, we've studied
other methods for doing it in other videos. And it's important to realize
what's really going on and how these different methods are all, on some level, doing the same thing, maybe just writing them different or doing them in different orders. So the way that we would tackle it using the standard algorithm,
probably the way that your parents first learned to multiply multi-digit numbers like this is we'll take all of the numbers in 6742, all of the various places,
and multiply it by three. And then we're gonna
multiply it times two 10s. And then we're gonna add everything up. So let's first multiply it times three. So we have two times three, that is six. Then we have four times three. And what people often say is, "Four times three is 12, write the two, "and then carry the one." But what really just happened is you said four 10s times three is 12 10s. 12 10s can be written as two 10s plus 100. Then we say seven times three is 21. And then you'll say, "Oh, I
have to add that other one, "so I get 22." But once again, what just happened? We said seven hundreds times three is 2100 plus another hundred is 22 hundreds, which can be expressed as two hundreds and two thousands. And then, last but not
least, six times three is 18 plus two is 20. But remember, we're
talking about thousands. So this is 20 thousands. So then we will move on to
the two 10s right over here. So two times two 10s is four 10s. Now some folks might be tempted to put the four over there,
but that's not four 10s. Four 10s would be right over here. And so it's common practice as you move to the next place value
over, as you get to this two, that people will just put a zero here just so they don't make that mistake. All right, now let's keep going. What is four times two? Well that's eight. We'll just write the
eight right over there. Why did that work? Well we're having four 10s times two 10s, well that's going to be eight times 10 times 10, eight hundreds. And then we say what is seven times two. That is 14, which of course we can write the four and then we can
carry the one, so to speak. And I'll cross these out
so I don't get confused. And then six times two is
going to be equal to 12, plus this one that we had carried, is 13. So there we go. And then we just have
to add everything up. And we are going to get six plus zero ones is six. Two 10s plus four 10s is six 10s. Two hundreds plus eight
hundreds is 10 hundreds, which you could do as zero
hundreds and one thousand. One thousand plus zero
thousands plus four thousands is five thousands. Two 10 thousands plus three 10 thousands is going to be five 10 thousands. And then we just have one hundred thousand right over there. So we've got 155,066. And we are done.